+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560).
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima Chair; Nakamura, Ward.
On March 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 320).
On March 30, 2021 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 468) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella, San Buenaventura). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-29-21.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1217) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kim ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keohokalole, Gabbard.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-21 9:30AM; Via Videoconference.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 305).
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Matsumoto, Okimoto, Perruso, Tokioka voting no (7) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 4, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Kapela, LoPresti, McKelvey voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Nakamura, Okimoto, Tokioka voting no (5) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
- Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 758) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, McKelvey, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka; 2 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, Nakamura; and Excused: none.
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to JHA, referral sheet 3
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor