+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Nakamura, Thielen excused (3).
- Reported from EEP/EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 226) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama.
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Thielen.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/EDB on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:40AM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to EEP/EDB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor