+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 12, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
On February 11, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 194) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Perruso, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 02-09-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor