+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to THA/HMS/EDU, WAM.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 129).
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 662), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 22, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-13 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, C. Lee, McKelvey, Takai, Thielen excused (6).
- Reported from OMH/EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 269), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Hanohano, Ichiyama, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
- The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami, C. Lee.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/EDN on Wednesday, 02-06-13 2:05PM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to OMH/EDN, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor