+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 02-12-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor