+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.