+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-12-19 4:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.