+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-02-17 2:00PM in conference room 329.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-02-17.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-22-17 2:01PM in House conference room 329.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kong voting no (1) and none excused (0).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Say, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Kong; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:30AM in conference room 325.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-17.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-02-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
- Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.