+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 006, 4/9/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Act 006, on 4/9/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1106).
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 373).
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 03-25-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 973) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Nishihara, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 1:30PM in conference room 414.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 119).
- Referred to GVO.
- Passed First Reading.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 588), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Choy, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Ohno, Ward.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 02-26-15 11:00AM in House conference room 312.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor