+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (49)
On July 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 165, 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
On July 3, 2019 in the House:
- Act 165, on 06/27/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1267).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 92).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 92) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, San Buenaventura, B. Kobayashi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Moriwaki, S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; S. Chang, L. Thielen, Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, San Buenaventura, B. Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Ward.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 843) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1928) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 04-01-19 10:45AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1420) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, WAM.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 112).
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 917), recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from HLT/HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 658) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/HSH on Wednesday, 02-13-19 9:15AM in House conference room 329.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT/HSH, FIN, referral sheet 8
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (5)
+ − Sponsors (19)
Type:
Primary Sponsor