+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 039, 5/6/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Act 039, on 5/6/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1139).
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 627).
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 622).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-15.
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 468).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 499) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Kouchi). Transmitted to House.
On April 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-15.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1366) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Espero.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 9:35AM in conference room 016.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
- Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 993) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL.
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Kahele, Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Nishihara.
On March 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-15 9:00AM in conference room 229.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 297).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 829) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Nakashima, Woodson, McDermott.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Re-referred to EDB, JUD, referral sheet 23
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC/JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1).
- Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 200) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC/JUD.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ito.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-10-15 9:00AM in House conference room 312.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Friday 02-06-15 9:20AM in conference room 312.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 02-06-15 9:20AM in House conference room 312.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to EDB, CPC/JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor