+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-13.
On January 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 01-30-13 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 17, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.