+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 1, 2015 in the House:
- Act 168, on 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1269).
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Act 168, 06/26/2015 (Gov. Msg. No. 1269).
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 680).
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On May 5, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 699).
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 36).
On April 30, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-05-15.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 36) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Espero, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 10:00AM in conference room 325.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 9:30AM in conference room 325.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Inouye Co-Chair; Espero, Shimabukuro, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Keohokalole Co-Chairs; San Buenaventura, McDermott.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 611) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1436) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Slom.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara, Slom.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 296).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Jordan, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 841) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-26-15 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 383) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Har, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Takumi, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-17-15 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.