+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Matsumoto excused (2).
- Reported from HUS/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 31) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Creagan, Hashem, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/HSG on Thursday, 02-05-15 10:00AM in House conference room 329.
- Referred to HUS/HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor