+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On February 19, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 598) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 18, 2021 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno.
On February 16, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-18-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor