+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:15AM in House conference room 325.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to AGR/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor