+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-07-19 8:59AM in House conference room 309.
- The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-19 8:59AM.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.