+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 384) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Ohno, Cachola, Kawakami, Kong, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ito.
On February 5, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TOU on Wednesday, 02-11-15 9:30AM in House conference room 312.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to TOU, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor