+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-15-13 10:35AM in conference room 325.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on WAL/OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-13 at 8:35am.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Re-referred to WAL/OMH, referral sheet 17
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to WAL, OMH, referral sheet 7
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor