+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TRE/WAM.
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee on TRE deferred the measure.
- The committee on ETT deferred the measure.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to TRE/ETT, WAM.
- The committee(s) on ETT/TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 2:00PM in conference room 414.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to ETT/TRE.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 332).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 969) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 22, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-17 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 659) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Thursday, 02-16-17 9:30AM in House conference room 423.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
- Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 222) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, Kong, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-09-17 8:30AM in House conference room 325.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EEP, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor