+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-03-15 1:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-03-15 at 1:00 pm in room 325.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-26-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) McDermott, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Pouha excused (1).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 300), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Kobayashi, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Oshiro, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-12-15 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to HUS, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor