+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 3, 2023 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HSG/EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 31, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/EEP on Friday, 02-03-23 10:35AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to HSG/EEP, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.