+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; Gabbard, Kouchi, Shimabukuro.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Rhoads, DeCoite Co-Chairs; C. Lee, McDermott.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 507) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1550) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Slom.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-02-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1103) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro, Espero, Gabbard, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
On March 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-24-15 9:00AM in conference room 016.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 145).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fukumoto Chang, Keohokalole, LoPresti, Matsumoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 812) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 563) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-17-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 23, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.