+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on TIA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 59-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to TIA.
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- The committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Quinlan, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Morikawa, Ohno, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Friday, 01-31-20 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LHE, TIA, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor