+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 456).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1172) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Yamane.
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-20-19.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 773) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, San Buenaventura, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:31AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor