+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-13 at 8:30am.
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-13 8:30AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-13 at 8:30am.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-13 10:00AM in conference room 329.
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-01-13 8:30AM in House conference room 329.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor