+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (44)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 016.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 10:20AM in conference room 016.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 at 4:00 pm in conference room 016.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-15 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-15 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-23-15 9:15AM in conference room 016.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; Kouchi Co-Chair; Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, San Buenaventura, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Brower, Har, McDermott.
- Re-referred to CPC, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 53
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 436).
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 486) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Galuteria). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from CPN/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1342) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-15.
On March 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Nishihara, Wakai.
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Riviere.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPN/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 9:00AM in conference room 211.
- Re-Referred to CPN/WAM.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPN.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 19).
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Souki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 614), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Nakashima, Woodson, McDermott.
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-26-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 20, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Ito excused (1).
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 489) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamane, Fukumoto Chang, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami.
On February 11, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-18-15.
On February 6, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-11-15 2:30PM in House conference room 325.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor