+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-08-23 11:40AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 4, 2023 in the House:
- The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-23.
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Re-referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 9
On February 1, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Saturday, 02-04-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to HLT, JHA/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor