+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on TRN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor