+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On November 30, 2017 in the House:
- Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 686) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Wednesday, 02-15-17 10:00AM in House conference room 325.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WAL with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
- Reported from TRN/HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 214) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WAL.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN/HSG on Wednesday, 02-08-17 11:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to TRN/HSG, WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.