+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 021, 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Act 021, on 04/23/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1122).
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 580).
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara). Transmitted to House.
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-03-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1734) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Fevella.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-29-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 14).
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Mizuno, Nakamura, Onishi excused (3).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 798), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor