+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 382) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Aquino, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Takumi.
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-13-15 9:30AM in House conference room 309.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor