+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee on HTH deferred the measure.
- The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-13 2:05PM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to HMS/HTH, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 339).
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 901) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 308.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-14-13 3:30PM in House conference room 308.
- Re-referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 22
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Har, McDermott excused (3).
- Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 201) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Cabanilla, Jordan, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 01-31-13 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
- Referred to HUS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor