+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 14, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:00AM in conference room 309.
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor