+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On February 5, 2021 in the House:
- The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 02-05-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
On February 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 27, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 26, 2021 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor