+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761).
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Failed to pass Final Reading. Ayes, 12. Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Ihara. Noes, 13 (Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Hee, Ige, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani, Kouchi, Nishihara, Solomon, L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom). Excused, 0 (none).
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and none excused (0).
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 18).
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-13.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 18) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-13 9:30AM in conference room 312.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 695).
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Galuteria, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- House conferees appointed: Takai Chair; Ito, Ward.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 568) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Green, Ige, Ihara, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Nishihara, Solomon, Wakai, Slom . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) L. Thielen). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1290) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green.
On March 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 04-02-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 03-19-13 2:45PM in conference room 224.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to PSM.
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-13 2:55PM in conference room 224.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to PSM, JDL.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 150).
On March 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Cabanilla, Fale, McDermott voting no (3) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On February 15, 2013 in the House:
- Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 605) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takayama, McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-13-13 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to VMI, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.