+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Wakai Co-Chair; Kanuha.
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 914).
On April 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
On April 13, 2023 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 849) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1798) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 28, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-23 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
On March 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1164) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
On March 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fukunaga.
On March 10, 2023 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-23 1:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
- Referred to EET, WAM.
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 414).
- Passed First Reading.
On March 7, 2023 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1172), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On March 1, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Alcos.
On February 27, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-23 2:30PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On February 15, 2023 in the House:
- Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 471) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Hussey-Burdick, Kong, Nakamura, Quinlan, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 6, 2023 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-08-23 10:15AM in House conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
On January 30, 2023 in the House:
- Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 3
On January 25, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 24, 2023 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor