+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-15 9:30AM in conference room 016.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 289).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Notice of bill proposing constitutional amendment transmitted to Governor pursuant to Article XVII, Section 3.
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 807) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
On February 27, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 19, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 368), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti.
On February 9, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-12-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor