+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On March 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to AGL/WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 210).
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2014 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-04-14.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 834-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa.
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-26-14 11:15AM in House conference room 308.
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 325) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Tokioka.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:15AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor