+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).
- Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 325) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Tokioka.
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-07-13 9:15AM in House conference room 312.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor