+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610).
On April 14, 2016 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 13, 2016 in the House:
- Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 647).
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferee(s) discharged.
On December 17, 2015 in the House:
- Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 05-01-15 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 27, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-29-15 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-27-15 3:05PM in conference room 309.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; Inouye, Slom.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 617).
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Johanson Chair; Kobayashi, Pouha.
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 641).
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 616).
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 607) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1470) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-14-15.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-15 1:30PM in conference room 211.
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 288).
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Say, Souki excused (2).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 600) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pouha.
On February 13, 2015 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-18-15 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 29, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 28, 2015 in the House:
- Pending introduction.