+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (57)
On June 23, 2017 in the House:
- Act 054, on 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154).
On June 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Act 054, 06/22/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1154).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Thielen voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran.
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 5:10PM in conference room 309.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Johanson, Nakamura; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 4:00PM in conference room 309.
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 174) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 174).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 1:35PM in conference room 229.
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:35PM in conference room 229.
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:40PM in conference room 229.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-25-17 1:40PM in conference room 229.
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:45PM in conference room 229.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Espero Chair; Keith-Agaran, Shimabukuro Co-Chairs.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Johanson, Nakamura Co-Chairs; McDermott.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 637) in amended form (SD 2).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
- Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1468) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, K. Kahele, Shimabukuro.
- The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-30-17 9:50AM in conference room 211.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL/WAM.
- Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1029) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL/WAM.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Harimoto, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-17 2:45PM in conference room 225.
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to HOU, JDL/WAM.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to HOU/JDL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 325).
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1020) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 700), recommending referral to FIN.
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-16-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ing excused (2).
- Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAB.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Quinlan; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-07-17 9:00AM in House conference room 423.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HSG, LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.