+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1496) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Fevella.
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 1:15PM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to WTL, WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 450).
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1282) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading.
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-25-19 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from PVM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 524), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:00AM in House conference room 430.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PVM, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor