+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (50)
On July 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 187, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
On July 5, 2019 in the House:
- Act 187, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1289).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 882).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- House agrees to Senate amendment(s).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 880).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-19.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 874).
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferee(s) discharged.
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 917).
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads, K. Kahele Co-Chairs; Kim, Fevella.
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Takayama, Aquino, C. Lee, Gates Co-Chairs; Kong, McDermott.
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 832) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-19.
- Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1938) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele.
- The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.
- Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1437) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC/WAM.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 03-20-19 1:15PM in conference room 225.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:00PM in conference room 225.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 265).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1126), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
On February 15, 2019 in the House:
- Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 744) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) McKelvey; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-14-19.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-13-19 3:00PM in House conference room 325.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
- Reported from PVM/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 70), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
- The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Ohno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- Bill re-scheduled to be heard by PVM/TRN on Friday 02-01-19 11:15AM in conference room 423.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by PVM/TRN on Friday, 02-01-19 11:15AM in House conference room 430.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to PVM/TRN, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.