+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-19 9:15AM in conference room 229.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-Referred to CPH.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to CPH, JDC.
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 264).
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1010), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Tuesday, 02-26-19.
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-26-19 2:00PM in conference room 325.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-22-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325.
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- Deferred one day 02-13-19.
- Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 252) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD.
On February 7, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-07-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
On February 1, 2019 in the House:
- Re-referred to CPC, JUD, referral sheet 11
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor