+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On December 18, 2013 in the House:
- Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to JDL, WAM.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 67).
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 619), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Tokioka.
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-14-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Har, Oshiro, Takumi excused (4).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 110), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 1, 2013 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Hashem, Aquino, Ichiyama, Ing, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane.
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 02-01-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Passed First Reading
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor