+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
- Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 238) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Creagan, Har, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
On February 1, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:01PM in House conference room 309.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor