+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 1, 2019 in the House:
- Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
- Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 383) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, McKelvey, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan.
On February 8, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-12-19 9:20AM in House conference room 309.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 6
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor