+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (40)
On June 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Act 113, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
On June 25, 2019 in the House:
- Act 113, on 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1215).
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
On May 1, 2019 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 129) as amended in (CD 1).
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 129).
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-19 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 533).
- Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella.
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 504).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 503).
On March 18, 2019 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
- House Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott.
On March 15, 2019 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 531) in amended form (SD 1).
On March 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice 03-15-19.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1214) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-11-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 143).
- Passed First Reading.
- Referred to WAM.
- The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
On March 1, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Nakashima excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1).
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 923), recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
On February 22, 2019 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to FIN, referral sheet 2
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced and Pass First Reading.
On January 17, 2019 in the House:
- Pending introduction.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor