+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (53)
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 206, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
On July 13, 2017 in the House:
- Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 206, 07/12/2017, (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
On May 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmitted to Governor.
- Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
On May 2, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola voting no (3) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none).
On April 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 172).
On April 28, 2017 in the House:
- Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
- Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 172) as amended in (CD 1).
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Dela Cruz, K. Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads.
On April 27, 2017 in the House:
- The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 2 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Luke; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-17 3:00PM in conference room 329.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 2:45PM in conference room 329.
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Rhoads, Dela Cruz Co-Chairs; K. Kahele.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
- Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
On April 17, 2017 in the House:
- House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Luke Co-Chairs; Matsumoto.
On April 13, 2017 in the House:
- House disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 549) in amended form (SD 1).
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- One Day Notice 04-11-17.
- Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1512) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, Galuteria, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, Inouye, Taniguchi, Wakai.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-29-17 1:40PM in conference room 211.
- Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
- Reported from EDU/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1133) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Inouye, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, L. Thielen.
- The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Kahele, Dela Cruz, Espero, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- The committee(s) on EDU/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-22-17 3:05PM in conference room 229.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to EDU/WTL, WAM.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed First Reading.
- Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 82).
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Cachola, Tokioka, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
- Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 903), recommending passage on Third Reading.
On February 28, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Tokioka, Ward; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola.
On February 24, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308.
On February 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
- Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 567) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
On February 15, 2017 in the House:
- The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Har, Creagan, Hashem, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
On February 10, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-17 2:00PM in conference room 309.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-17.
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled for decision-making on Wednesday, 02-08-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On February 3, 2017 in the House:
- The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-17.
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 02-03-17 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
On January 20, 2017 in the House:
- Pass First Reading
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Pending introduction.